FL S1366 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Management Services to oversee a Pay-for-Success Contract Program; authorizing the department, contingent upon funding, to negotiate and enter into pay-for-success contracts with private entities to fund high-quality dropout prevention programs; requiring the Office of Economic and Demographic Research to provide information to the department to assist in determining performance outcome measures, etc.
Title
High School Student Retention
Sponsors
Sen. Jeremy Ring [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Appropriations |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1099 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1366 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1366/BillText/Filed/HTML |