FL H1099 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates Pay-for-Success Contract Program; provides that SBE may enter into contracts with certain entities to create dropout prevention programs for high-risk students; provides duties of SBE, contract requirements, dropout prevention program requirements, reporting requirements, & rulemaking; authorizes estimate of certain costs to state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dropout Prevention

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseDied in K-12 Subcommittee
2015-03-08HouseReferred to K-12 Subcommittee; Education Appropriations Subcommittee; Education Committee
2015-03-03HouseIntroduced
2015-02-26HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1366 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003531Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback