IL HB4144 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-26 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PUBLIC WATER SUPPLY DISRUPT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-26SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen
2024-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
2024-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
2024-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
2024-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2024
2024-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2024-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2024
2024-05-15SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 007-004-000
2024-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2024-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2024-05-15SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2024-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2024-05-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2024-05-10SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
2024-05-01SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
2024-05-01SenateAssigned to Executive
2024-04-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-04-18SenateFirst Reading
2024-04-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
2024-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2024-04-18SenateArrive in Senate
2024-04-17HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
2024-04-12HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-04-12HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-03-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-03-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 024-000-000
2024-03-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2024-02-29HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2023-10-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-10-18HouseFirst Reading
2023-09-21HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nabeela Syed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
415519.11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback