FL S1276 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Litigation Investment Safeguards and Transparency Act"; requiring a court's consideration of potential conflicts of interest which may arise from the existence of a litigation financing agreement in specified circumstances; prohibiting specified acts by litigation financiers; requiring certain disclosures related to litigation financing agreements and the involvement of foreign persons, foreign principals, or sovereign wealth funds; requiring the indemnification of specified fees, costs, and sanctions by a litigation financier in specified circumstances, etc.
Title
Litigation Financing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-07 - Senate - Senate Fiscal Policy (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2024-02-08 | Senate | CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 15 NAYS 5 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 02/07/24, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/22/24, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Fiscal Policy |
2024-01-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1179 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |