FL S1260 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for the e-mail addresses of voter registration applicants and voters; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption under the Open Government Sunset Review Act; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/E-mail Addresses/Voter Registration Applicants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 249 (Vetoed by Governor) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/13 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/13, 2:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/09/13, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2013-03-12 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/11/13, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1352 (Related) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
H0249 (Similar To) 2013-06-14 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192)
H0247 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-192, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
H0249 (Similar To) 2013-06-14 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192)
H0247 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-192, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)