FL S1352 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the uniform statewide voter registration application be designed to elicit the e-mail address of an applicant and whether the applicant desires to receive sample ballots by e-mail; authorizing the property appraiser to notify taxpayers of proposed property taxes by posting the notice on the appraiser's website in lieu of first-class mail when approved by the county governing board; authorizing the property appraiser to provide e-mail notification when the proposed taxes and assessments are available on the appraiser's website, etc.
Title
Paper Reduction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 247 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (773762, 775338) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/23/13, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/17/13, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2013-03-25 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/20/13, 3:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Ethics and Elections (475764); YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/11/13, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1260 (Related) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192)
H0247 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-192, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
H0249 (Similar To) 2013-06-14 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192)
H7159 (Similar To) 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2013-83), SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
S1830 (Similar To) 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-72, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2013-83)
H0247 (Similar To) 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-192, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
H0249 (Similar To) 2013-06-14 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192)
H7159 (Similar To) 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2013-83), SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
S1830 (Similar To) 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-72, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2013-83)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 069 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |