FL H0247 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-192, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-192, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that uniform statewide voter registration application be designed to elicit e-mail address of applicant & whether applicant desires to receive sample ballots by e-mail; authorizes supervisor of elections to send sample ballot to registered elector by e-mail under certain circumstances; permits electronic filing of certain affidavits; authorizes clerk of court to mail or electronically transmit notice relating to bond forfeiture proceeding.
Title
Paper Reduction
Sponsors
House Local and Federal Affairs Committee | House Government Operations Subcommittee | Rep. Bryan Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#423 (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#254 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#33 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#254 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Chapter No. 2013-192, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72) | |
2013-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-10 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-05-02 | House | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled |
2013-05-02 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 119 NAYS 0 |
2013-05-02 | House | Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (966796) 1099 |
2013-04-30 | House | In returning messages |
2013-04-30 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (966796) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 1352 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Community Affairs |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs |
2013-04-25 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-25 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-24 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 3rd Reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-23 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (159113, 345443) |
2013-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/23/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13 |
2013-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/28/13, 10:30 am, Morris Hall |
2013-03-19 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | CS/CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2013-03-18 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-14 | House | CS/CS by Local and Federal Affairs Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-12 | House | On Committee agenda-- Local and Federal Affairs Committee, 03/14/13, 1:30 pm, Webster Hall |
2013-03-08 | House | Now in Local and Federal Affairs Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | CS referred to Local and Federal Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | Original reference(s) removed: Regulatory Affairs Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-07 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-06 | House | CS by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/06/13, 10:00 am, Webster Hall |
2013-01-30 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Local and Federal Affairs Committee; Regulatory Affairs Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2013-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0249 (Related) 2013-06-14 - Vetoed by Governor, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192)
H7159 (Similar To) 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2013-83), SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
S1260 (Similar To) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192)
S1352 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
S1830 (Similar To) 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-72, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2013-83)
H7159 (Similar To) 2013-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2013-83), SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
S1260 (Similar To) 2013-04-25 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192)
S1352 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), SB 1830 (Ch. 2013-72)
S1830 (Similar To) 2013-05-30 - Chapter No. 2013-72, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 247 (Ch. 2013-192), CS/CS/HB 437 (Ch. 2013-83)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 66 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
192 | 0105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
192 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
194 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
197 | 3635 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
200 | 069 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
553 | 79 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
648 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
903 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 052 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |