FL S1084 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 805 (Ch. 2021-90)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing certain medical staff of a volunteer ambulance service to use red lights on a privately owned vehicle under certain circumstances; authorizing vehicles of volunteer ambulance services to show or display red lights and operate emergency lights and sirens under certain circumstances; prohibiting certain medical staff of volunteer ambulance services from operating red warning signals when not responding to an emergency in the line of duty; exempting certain first responder agencies from certificate of public convenience and necessity requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Volunteer Ambulance Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 805 (Ch. 2021-90)
2021-04-26SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 805
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-21SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 3
2021-04-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/21, 4:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-12SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-12SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations
2021-03-12SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Community Affairs
2021-03-11SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2021-03-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-10SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/10/21, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Health Policy; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2021-02-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H805 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Chapter No. 2021-90

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162397Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162398Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40125Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1084
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1084/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1084/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1084/Amendment/446228/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1084/Analyses/2021s01084.pre.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1084/Analyses/2021s01084.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1084/Analyses/2021s01084.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1084/Analyses/2021s01084.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1084/Vote/2021-03-10%201030AM~S01084%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1084/Vote/2021-04-21%200430PM~S01084%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback