FL H0805 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 26 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain medical staff of a volunteer ambulance service to use red lights on a privately owned vehicle under certain circumstances; authorizing vehicles of volunteer ambulance services to show or display red lights and operate emergency lights and sirens under certain circumstances; authorizing privately owned vehicles belonging to certain medical staff of a volunteer ambulance service to display or use red warning signals under certain circumstances; providing that county and municipal governments may not limit, prohibit, or prevent volunteer ambulance services from responding to emergencies or providing emergency medical services or transport within their respective jurisdictions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Volunteer Ambulance Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#272 (Y: 98 N: 12 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Professions & Public Health Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-26HouseOrdered enrolled
2021-04-26HouseIn Messages
2021-04-26SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-26SenateSubstituted for CS/SB 1084
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-26SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2021-04-23SenateReceived
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-23HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-23SenateIn Messages
2021-04-23HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 98, NAYS 12
2021-04-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-22HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-22HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-22HouseAmendment 915917 Failed
2021-04-22HouseAmendment 243695 Failed
2021-04-22HouseAmendment 355619 Failed
2021-04-22HouseAmendment 042015 superseded by substitute
2021-04-22HouseAmendment 724159 adopted
2021-04-22HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-20HouseAmendment 724159 filed
2021-04-20HouseAmendment 915917 filed
2021-04-20HouseAmendment 355619 filed
2021-04-20HouseAmendment 243695 filed
2021-04-20HouseAmendment 042015 filed
2021-04-19House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 3)
2021-04-19HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/22/2021)
2021-04-19HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-19HouseCS Filed
2021-04-19HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-19HouseReported out of Health & Human Services Committee
2021-04-19HouseFavorable with CS by Health & Human Services Committee
2021-04-18HouseAdded to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
2021-04-05HouseNow in Health & Human Services Committee
2021-04-05HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-04-05House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2021-04-02HouseCS Filed
2021-04-02HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-04-01HouseReported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-04-01HouseFavorable with CS by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-30HouseAdded to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-26HouseNow in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-26HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-03-26HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-03-26HouseOriginal reference removed: Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-03-25House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-24HouseCS Filed
2021-03-24HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-24HouseReported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-03-23HouseFavorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-03-19HouseAdded to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-22HouseNow in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Health & Human Services Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
2021-02-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1084 (Same As) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 805

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
316003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162397Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3162398Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
401211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40125Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/BillText/c2/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/BillText/c3/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/BillText/e1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Amendment/229981/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Amendment/042015/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Amendment/355619/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Amendment/243695/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Amendment/915917/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Amendment/724159/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Analyses/h0805.PPH.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Analyses/h0805a.PPH.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Analyses/h0805b.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Analyses/h0805c.LAV.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Analyses/h0805d.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Analyses/h0805e.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Analyses/h0805f.HHS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Analyses/h0805z.PPH.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Vote/HouseVote_h00805e1272.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/805/Vote/SenateVote_h00805e1028.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59165&IsPCB=0&BillId=71502
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59856&IsPCB=0&BillId=71502
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60540&IsPCB=0&BillId=71502

Bill Comments 750

feedback