FL S1018 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Chapter No. 2017-95
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "Public Notice of Pollution Act"; defining the term "reportable pollution release"; requiring an owner or operator of an installation at which a reportable pollution release occurred to provide certain information to the department within 24 hours after the discovery of the release; creating the State Watch Office within the Division of Emergency Management, etc.
Title
Pollution
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Environmental Preservation and Conservation Committee | Sen. Denise Grimsley [R] | Sen. Bill Galvano [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#407 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Chapter No. 2017-95 | |
2017-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-05-31 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2017-05-03 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-05-02 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/CS/HB 753 |
2017-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-01 | House | Received |
2017-05-01 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/17 |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | In Messages |
2017-05-01 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (440404, 476894, 856958) 544 |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources, 04/13/17, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources |
2017-03-15 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/14/17, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Appropriations Subcommittee on the Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0753 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1018 (Ch. 2017-95)
S352 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages
H1065 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1018 (Ch. 2017-95)
S532 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1018 (Ch. 2017-95)
S352 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages
H1065 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1018 (Ch. 2017-95)
S532 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1018 (Ch. 2017-95)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 2016 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
220 | 1845 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 3071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 30713 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 3078 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 30781 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
376 | 86 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 076 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 077 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 078 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |