FL S0352 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that candidate qualifying, nomination, and election for certain offices must proceed using current district boundaries if revisions to districts subject to a court challenge are not made as of a certain date; specifying public oversight procedures that a court is encouraged to follow when drafting a remedial redistricting plan, etc.
Title
Legislative Redistricting and Congressional Reapportionment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#39 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#366 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#366 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#3 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in returning Messages |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-05-04 | House | In returning messages |
2017-05-04 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (547997) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (300958) |
2017-04-28 | Senate | In returning messages |
2017-04-28 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (547997) |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 953 |
2017-04-24 | House | Received |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | In Messages |
2017-03-21 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 24 NAYS 14 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/15/17 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/09/17, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 3 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/21/17, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Now in Ethics and Elections |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/07/17, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Filed |