FL S1000 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1355 (Ch. 2013-249)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1355 (Ch. 2013-249)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing conditions under which a person who has been voluntarily admitted to a mental institution for treatment and has undergone an involuntary examination under the Baker Act may be prohibited from purchasing a firearm; providing requirements for the examining physician; providing requirements with respect to the filing of specified records with the court and presentation of such records to a judge or magistrate; providing lawful authority of a judge or magistrate to review specified records and order such records be submitted to the Department of Law Enforcement, etc.
Title
Purchase of Firearms by Mentally Ill Persons
Sponsors
Sen. Lizbeth Benacquisto [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] | Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1355 (Ch. 2013-249) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1355 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/22/13, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/15/13, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-04-03 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/01/13, 12:15 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1355 (Same As) 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-249