FL H1355 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-249
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Chapter No. 2013-249
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides conditions under which person who has been voluntarily admitted to mental institution for treatment & has undergone involuntary examination under Baker Act may be prohibited from purchasing firearm; provides requirements for examining physician; provides for judicial review of certain findings; provides specified notice requirements; provides form & contents of notice; provides requirements with respect to filing of specified records with court & presentation of such records to judge or magistrate; provides lawful authority of judge or magistrate to review specified records & order that such records be submitted to FDLE; provides a timeframe for submission of records to FDLE upon order of record by judge or magistrate.
Title
Purchase of Firearms by Mentally Ill Persons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#150 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#150 (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Chapter No. 2013-249 | |
2013-06-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-30 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1000 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Received |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2013-04-18 | Senate | In Messages |
2013-04-17 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 1 |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-15 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/13 |
2013-04-01 | House | CS/CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-28 | House | CS/CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-26 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 03/28/13, 10:30 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-21 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time |
2013-03-20 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.19(c) |
2013-03-19 | House | CS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 03/19/13, 9:00 am, 404 HOB |
2013-03-08 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2013-03-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1000 (Same As) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1355 (Ch. 2013-249)