FL S0998 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 823 (Ch. 2021-110), CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that alarm system contractors are not required to state their certification and registration numbers in or on certain advertisements if the contractor maintains an Internet website that displays such information and the advertisement directs consumers to the website; authorizing a contractor to begin repairing certain fire alarm systems after filing an application for a required permit but before receiving the permit, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contractor Advertising

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 823 (Ch. 2021-110), CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
2021-04-21SenateSubstituted CS/HB 823
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-15SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2021-04-14SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/14/21
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-06SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2021-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/06/21, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-24SenateNow in Rules
2021-03-24SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2021-03-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/24/21, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
2021-03-17SenateNow in Community Affairs
2021-03-16SenateFavorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2021-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 03/16/21, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-10SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
2021-02-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H823 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-110; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
S1408 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 823 (Ch. 2021-110), CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
H1209 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-113

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
489521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5537921Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/998
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/998/BillText/Filed/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/998/Analyses/2021s00998.pre.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/998/Analyses/2021s00998.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/998/Analyses/2021s00998.pre.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/998/Analyses/2021s00998.ca.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/998/Analyses/2021s00998.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/998/Analyses/2021s00998.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/998/Vote/2021-03-16%200330PM~S00998%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/998/Vote/2021-03-24%200830AM~S00998%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/998/Vote/2021-04-06%200930AM~S00998%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback