FL S1408 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 823 (Ch. 2021-110), CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying powers and duties of the Division of Public Assistance Fraud; specifying a condition that must be met before certain firefighter cancer-related benefits may be paid from the State Risk Management Trust Fund; specifying a criminal penalty for the willful and knowing dissemination of a sexual harassment victim's personal identifying information, except under certain circumstances; prohibiting persons from acting as or advertising themselves as being funeral directors, embalmers, direct disposers, or preneed sales agents unless they are so licensed; prohibiting a firesafety inspector from knowingly and intentionally requesting, soliciting, accepting, or agreeing to accept certain compensation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Department of Financial Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 823 (Ch. 2021-110), CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
2021-04-26SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1209
2021-04-26SenateAmendment(s) adopted (509138)
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-22SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-20SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2021-04-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/20/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-15SenateNow in Rules
2021-04-15SenateFavorable by Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 1
2021-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-15SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-03-15SenateRemaining references corrected to Appropriations; Rules
2021-03-15SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2021-03-11SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2021-03-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-10SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2021-03-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/10/21, 8:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-24SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2021-02-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H137 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 286 (Ch. 2021-123), CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
H415 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
H587 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
H717 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1598 (Ch. 2021-104), CS/CS/CS/SB 76 (Ch. 2021-77)
H815 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died on Second Reading Calendar; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
H823 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-110; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
S286 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Chapter No. 2021-123, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
S360 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
S742 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
S998 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 823 (Ch. 2021-110), CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
H1209 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-113
S1902 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Banking and Insurance, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28430Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28431Amended CodeSee Bill Text
284385Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28445Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4971411Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
497159Amended CodeSee Bill Text
552081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5537921Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6262815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626371Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6268443Amended CodeSee Bill Text
626916Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633217Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64830Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943045Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/Amendment/918012/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/Amendment/509138/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/Analyses/2021s01408.pre.bi.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/Analyses/2021s01408.bi.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/Analyses/2021s01408.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/Analyses/2021s01408.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/Analyses/2021s01408.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/Analyses/2021s01408.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/Vote/2021-03-10%200800AM~S01408%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/Vote/2021-04-15%200900AM~S01408%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/1408/Vote/2021-04-20%200830AM~S01408%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback