FL H0823 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-110; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that advertisements for alarm system contracting do not have to include contractor's registration or certification number; authorizes contractor to begin repairing specified fire alarm system under certain conditions; provides that repaired fire alarm system is not compliant with applicable codes & standards until certain conditions are met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alarm System Contractors

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#2 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#156 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17 Chapter No. 2021-110; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
2021-06-16 Approved by Governor
2021-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-21HouseOrdered enrolled
2021-04-21HouseIn Messages
2021-04-21SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2021-04-21SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-21SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-21SenateSubstituted for SB 998
2021-04-21SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-21SenateWithdrawn from Rules
2021-04-20SenateReceived
2021-04-19SenateReferred to Rules
2021-04-15SenateIn Messages
2021-04-15HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-15HouseImmediately certified
2021-04-15HouseCS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
2021-04-15HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-08HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/15/2021)
2021-03-16HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-03-16HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-03-16HouseReported out of Commerce Committee
2021-03-16HouseFavorable by Commerce Committee
2021-03-12HouseAdded to Commerce Committee agenda
2021-03-10HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2021-03-10HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-03-09House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-09HouseCS Filed
2021-03-09HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-08HouseReported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-08HouseFavorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-03-04HouseAdded to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-02House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-02-22HouseNow in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Commerce Committee
2021-02-22HouseReferred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
2021-02-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S998 (Similar To) 2021-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 823 (Ch. 2021-110), CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
S1408 (Similar To) 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 823 (Ch. 2021-110), CS/CS/CS/HB 1209 (Ch. 2021-113)
H1209 (Similar To) 2021-06-17 - Chapter No. 2021-113

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
489521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5537921Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/BillText/c1/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/BillText/er/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/Amendment/790685/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/Amendment/176619/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/Analyses/h0823.RRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/Analyses/h0823a.RRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/Analyses/h0823b.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/Analyses/h0823c.COM.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/Analyses/h0823z.RRS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/Analyses/h0823z1.RRS.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/Vote/HouseVote_h00823c1156.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/823/Vote/SenateVote_h00823c1002.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=57454&IsPCB=0&BillId=71543
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=58890&IsPCB=0&BillId=71543

Bill Comments 750

feedback