FL S0930 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Withdrawn prior to introduction
Status: Introduced on December 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Withdrawn prior to introduction
Summary
Authorizes a law enforcement officer to arrest a person without a warrant when there is probable cause to believe the person has committed any of specified driving or boating under the influence violations.
Title
Driving or Boating Under the Influence [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | Withdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations; Withdrawn prior to introduction | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2009-12-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0247 (Similar To) 2010-02-02 - Withdrawn from Public Safety & Domestic Security Policy (CCJP); Criminal & Civil Justice Appropriations (CGHC); Criminal & Civil Justice Policy Council; Withdrawn prior to introduction -HJ 00028
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0930&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010 |