FL S0862 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding an existing public records exemption to include the administrative sealing of specified criminal history records; providing for future review and repeal of the expanded exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Sealing of Criminal History Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-06SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-02-01SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-01-30SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-29SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-29SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2017-11-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S860 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
S692 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
H921 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H919 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S690 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430586Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943059Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback