FL H0919 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Criminal Justice Information Program to administratively seal criminal history records of minor upon notification by clerk of court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal History Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-13HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-12-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H921 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S860 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
S690 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S692 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S862 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430586Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback