FL H0921 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expands existing public records exemption to include administrative sealing of specified criminal history records of minors; provides for future review & repeal of expanded exemption; provides for reversion of specified language if exemption is not saved from repeal; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. Rec./Sealing of Criminal History Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10HouseDied in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2018-03-10HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-12-13HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-12-06HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H919 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S862 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
S690 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S692 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S860 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
943059Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback