FL S0860 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Criminal Justice Information Program to administratively seal the criminal history records of a minor upon notification by the clerk of the court under specified circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal History Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-01SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-30SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-29SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2018-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/29/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-29SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2017-11-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S862 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
S690 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
H919 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H921 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S692 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430586Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback