FL S0694 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exception to the requirement that state officers and employees designate a charitable organization to receive their contributions from the Florida State Employees' Charitable Campaign; requiring the fiscal agent selected by the Department of Management Services to distribute undesignated funds in a specified manner, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida State Employees' Charitable Campaign

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#214 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22 Chapter No. 2015-61
2015-05-21 Approved by Governor
2015-05-07 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2015-04-22SenateOrdered enrolled
2015-04-22HousePassed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HouseSubstituted for HB 719
2015-04-17HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15
2015-04-17HouseReceived
2015-04-17HouseReferred to Calendar
2015-04-14HouseIn Messages
2015-04-08SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2015-04-08SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-02SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2015-04-02SenateRead 2nd time
2015-04-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/02/15
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/01/15
2015-03-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-03-26SenateFavorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2015-03-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/26/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-18SenateNow in Fiscal Policy
2015-03-17SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2015-03-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government, 03/17/15, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2015-03-04SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government
2015-03-04SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/04/15, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2015-02-06SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government; Fiscal Policy
2015-02-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0719 (Same As) 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 694 (Ch. 2015-61)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110181Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback