FL H0719 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 694 (Ch. 2015-61)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-21 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 694 (Ch. 2015-61)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides exception to requirement that state officers & employees designate charitable organization to receive their contributions from Florida State Employees' Charitable Campaign; deletes requirements for independent unaffiliated agencies, international service agencies, & national agencies; requires fiscal agent selected by DMS to distribute undesignated funds in specified manner; deletes requirement that local steering committee be established in each fiscal agent area.
Title
Florida State Employees' Charitable Campaign
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 694 (Ch. 2015-61) |
2015-04-21 | House | Substituted SB 694 |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/15 |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-03-26 | House | Favorable by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-24 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 03/26/15, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-03-17 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/17/15, 12:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2015-03-11 | House | Now in Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee |
2015-03-11 | House | Favorable by Government Operations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Government Operations Subcommittee, 03/11/15, 8:00 am, Webster Hall |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee; Government Operations Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0694 (Same As) 2015-05-22 - Chapter No. 2015-61
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/719 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0719/BillText/Filed/PDF |