FL S0694 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Unfavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, laid on Table; YEAS 1 NAYS 2 -SJ 471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-19 - Unfavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, laid on Table; YEAS 1 NAYS 2 -SJ 471
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes reporting requirements for assisted living facilities relating to liability claims.
Title
Assisted Living Facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Unfavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, laid on Table; YEAS 1 NAYS 2 -SJ 471 | |
2011-04-11 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/12/11, 3:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building | |
2011-03-30 | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 04/04/11, 3:15 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Pending Reconsideration (Unfavorable; YEAS 1 NAYS 2) | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced -SJ 57 | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Health Regulation; Banking and Insurance -SJ 57 | |
2011-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H4051 () 2011-04-14 - Original bill laid on Table, under Rule 7.19(a), refer to combined CS/HB 4045, HB 4047, HB 4049, HB 4051, HB 4053 (Vetoed by Governor)
H0119 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1458 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
H0119 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
S1458 () 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/694 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2011/0694/BillText/Filed/HTML |