FL S1458 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes adult care communities from the standards and rules of the Agency for Health Care Administration which apply to registered pharmacists under contract with a nursing home and related health care facilities. Provides that assisted living facilities are exempt from certain provisions authorizing the agency to impose administrative fines for violations of laws and applicable rules. Requires the agency to provide for the establishment of a demonstration project for a psychiatric facility in Miami-Dade County, etc.
Title
Assisted Care Communities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-07 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | |
2011-04-13 | Now in Budget -SJ 468 | |
2011-04-12 | Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 -SJ 468 | |
2011-04-07 | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs -SJ 408 | |
2011-04-06 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2011-04-04 | CS by Health Regulation; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 408 | |
2011-03-30 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 04/04/11, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building | |
2011-03-23 | On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 03/28/11, 3:15 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Health Regulation; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Budget -SJ 165 | |
2011-03-01 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
400 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
408 | 820 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
409 | 912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 178 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 195 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 256 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 275 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 445 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
429 | 81 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 505 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |