FL S0618 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 581
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 581
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing an investigative or law enforcement officer conducting an investigation into specified matters to subpoena certain persons or entities for the production of records, documents, or other tangible things and testimony; authorizing a subpoenaed person to petition a court for an order modifying or setting aside the subpoena or a prohibition on disclosure; authorizing a court to punish a person who does not comply with a subpoena as indirect criminal contempt, etc.
Title
Subpoenas in Investigations of Sexual Offenses
Sponsors
Senate Judiciary Committee | Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. Dennis Baxley [R] | Sen. Greg Steube [R] |
Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Darryl Rouson [D] | Sen. Debbie Mayfield [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 581 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 581 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 9 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-23 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/18/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Remaining references corrected to Judiciary; Rules |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations |
2018-01-11 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-01-09 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/09/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-10-24 | Senate | Filed |