FL S1256 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the exceptions to conduct that constitute unlawful access to stored communications; authorizing an investigative or law enforcement officer to apply to a judge of competent jurisdiction for a warrant, rather than an order, authorizing real-time location tracking or acquisition of historical location data; authorizing any investigative or law enforcement officer who is specially designated by certain persons and who makes specified determinations to engage in real-time location tracking if a warrant is later obtained as specified, etc.
Title
Search of the Content, Information, and Communications of Cellular Phones, Portable Electronic Communication Devices, and Microphone-enabled Household Devices
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. Jeffrey Brandes [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Messages |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-03-07 | House | In Messages |
2018-03-07 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (739040) 764 |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2018-02-19 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/22/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules |
2017-12-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1249 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H581 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-93
S618 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 581
H581 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-93
S618 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 581
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
92 | 605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 26 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
934 | 42 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |