CA SB910 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 641, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 641, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11972 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to courts.
Title
Treatment court program standards.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] | Sen. Aisha Wahab [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB910 Umberg et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 910 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB910 Umberg et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 910 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Kalra (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB910 Umberg et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 641, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5747.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6714.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4135.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3963.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3729.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3560.) (April 10). |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB S. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11972 | Amended Code | Citation Text |