FL H0581 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-93
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes law enforcement agency to issue & serve subpoena in investigation of specified sexual offenses; specifies requirements regarding nondisclosure of information; provides for judicial review of nondisclosure requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Subpoenas in Investigations of Sexual Offenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#715 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27 Chapter No. 2018-93
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-21 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09HouseOrdered enrolled
2018-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted for CS/CS/SB 618
2018-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-08SenateWithdrawn from Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2018-03-02SenateReceived
2018-03-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2018-03-01SenateIn Messages
2018-03-01HouseCS passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2018-03-01HouseRead 3rd time 756
2018-02-28HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-02-28HouseRead 2nd time
2018-02-22HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18
2018-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-02-15HouseFavorable by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2018-02-13HouseOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/15/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-29HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2018-01-29HouseCS referred to Judiciary Committee
2018-01-29HouseOriginal reference(s) removed: Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
2018-01-26HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2018-01-26HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2018-01-24HouseCS by Criminal Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-22HouseOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice Subcommittee, 01/24/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall
2018-01-09HouseIntroduced
2017-11-15HouseReferred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee
2017-11-08HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S618 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 581
S1256 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
934255Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback