FL S0598 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Chapter No. 2020-3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Chapter No. 2020-3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting provisions which have become inoperative by noncurrent repeal or expiration and, pursuant to s. 11.242(5)(b) and (i), F.S., may be omitted from the 2020 Florida Statutes only through a reviser's bill duly enacted by the Legislature, etc.
Title
Florida Statutes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#404 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Chapter No. 2020-3 | |
2020-02-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-02-10 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-01-29 | House | Passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-29 | House | Substituted for HB 7033 |
2020-01-23 | House | Received |
2020-01-23 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/29/20 |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-01-22 | House | In Messages |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/22/20 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/15/20, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7033 (Same As) 2020-01-29 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 598
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1011 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 60 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1011 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
339 | 135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
343 | 1013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
403 | 087 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
427 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 034 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
766 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
937 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |