FL S0596 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying the responsibilities of regional counsels regarding witness coordination; removing the requirement that regional counsel employees be governed by Justice Administrative Commission classification and salary and benefits plans; authorizing regional counsels to access certain confidential information relating to proceedings involving children under specified circumstances; authorizing regional counsel offices to obtain fictitious names for motor vehicle and vessel plates or decals, etc.
Title
Criminal Conflict and Civil Regional Counsels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#807 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-08 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-07 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-04 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2) |
2022-03-04 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022) |
2022-03-04 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-01 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22 |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 01/19/22, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2022-01-11 | Senate | CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/10/22, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S598 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
H383 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 596
H385 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 598
H383 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 596
H385 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 598
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 1912 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 0065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
39 | 0132 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
393 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 916 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
92 | 153 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
945 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
985 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |