FL H0383 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jan 31 @ 3:00 pm House Appropriations Committee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Specifies responsibilities of regional counsels regarding witness coordination; removes requirement that regional counsel employees be governed by JAC classification & salary & benefits plans; modifying procedures for Supreme Court Judicial Nominating Commission in nominating candidates for regional counsel positions; revises provisions related to duties of regional counsels.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Conflict and Civil Regional Counsels

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-02 - House - House Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-27HouseAdded to Appropriations Committee agenda
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2022-01-11House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-12-03HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2021-12-03HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-12-03HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-12-02HouseCS Filed
2021-12-02HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-12-02HouseReported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-12-02HouseFavorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-11-23HouseAdded to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
2021-11-05HouseNow in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-11-05HouseReferred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
2021-10-21HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H385 (Related) 2022-01-27 - Now in Judiciary Committee
S596 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Now in Appropriations
S598 (Similar To) 2022-01-19 - Now in Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11219Amended CodeSee Bill Text
270065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2753Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
390132Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394916Amended CodeSee Bill Text
744331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
92153Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94510Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94548Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985045Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback