FL S0588 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding grounds for the reclassification of crimes to include prejudice based on the gender or gender identity of the victim; expanding grounds for reclassification of crimes to include prejudice based on a disability of the victim, etc.
Title
Crimes Evidencing Prejudice
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 3 NAYS 2 |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations; Rules |
2017-10-20 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H211 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0863 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/588 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/588/BillText/Filed/HTML |