FL H0211 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires grounds for reclassification of crimes to include prejudice based on gender or gender identity of victim; defines "gender identity"; requires grounds for reclassification of crimes to include prejudice based on disability of victim; revises definition of term "disability."
Title
Crimes Evidencing Prejudice
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Geller [D] | Rep. Al Jacquet [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Rep. Evan Jenne [D] |
Rep. David Richardson [D] | Rep. Carlos Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-10-12 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-09-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S588 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 085 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
775 | 0863 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
921 | 0022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/211 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/211/BillText/Filed/PDF |