FL S0418 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 322 (Ch. 2019-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 322 (Ch. 2019-129)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Insurance Regulation to conduct a study evaluating this state's current benchmark plan for essential health benefits under the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA) and options for changing the benchmark plan for future plan years; requiring the office, in conducting the study, to consider plans and certain benefits used by other states and to compare costs with those of this state, etc.
Title
Essential Health Benefits Under Health Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 322 (Ch. 2019-129) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 1 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/10/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/01/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-27 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Now in Health Policy |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/25/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H997 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 322 (Ch. 2019-129)
S322 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-129
S322 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-129
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
627 | 443 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
627 | 6054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |