FL S0322 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Revising eligibility requirements for multiple-employer welfare arrangements; authorizing health insurers and health maintenance organizations to create new health insurance policies and health maintenance contracts meeting certain criteria for essential health benefits under the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (PPACA); defining the terms "operative date" and "preexisting medical condition" with respect to individual and group health insurance policies, respectively, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Plans

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#345 (Y: 70 N: 42 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 16 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 13
2019-05-03SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (819705)
2019-05-01SenateIn returning messages
2019-05-01HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 70 NAYS 42
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30HouseAmendment(s) adopted (819705) 1080
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HouseReceived
2019-04-29HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-25HouseIn Messages
2019-04-25SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 14
2019-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24SenateOrdered engrossed
2019-04-24SenateAmendment(s) adopted (220604)
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-10SenateRetained on Calendar
2019-04-08SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/19
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-03-13SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 1
2019-03-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/13/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-07SenateCS/CS by Health Policy read 1st time
2019-03-07SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-05SenateCS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2019-03-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateCS/CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/04/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-02-22SenateNow in Health Policy
2019-02-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-02-19SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/19/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-01-25SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Health Policy; Rules
2019-01-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H997 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table
S418 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
S1422 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
624438Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627443Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276046Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276426Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627654Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62765612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/BillText/e2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Amendment/863736/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Amendment/135410/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Amendment/759612/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Amendment/429470/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Amendment/909028/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Amendment/925284/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Amendment/286760/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Amendment/220604/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Amendment/636148/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Amendment/130946/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Vote/SenateVote_s00322c2004.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Vote/SenateVote_s00322c2005.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Vote/SenateVote_s00322e1009.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Vote/HouseVote_s00322e1345.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/322/Vote/SenateVote_s00322e1022.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback