FL S0348 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the lifetime maximum cap on covered expenses for a child enrolled in the Florida Healthy Kids program, etc.
Title
Florida Kidcare Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#683 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Chapter No. 2020-12 | |
2020-04-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-04-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed; YEAS 115 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-02-19 | House | In Messages |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/12/20 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/06/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled |
2020-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/05/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 12/11/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 11/05/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-10-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6031 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 348 passed