FL S0226 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Renaming the Competency-Based Education Pilot Program as the Mastery-Based Education Pilot Program; authorizing a district school board or developmental research school participating in the Mastery-Based Education Pilot Program to award credit based on student mastery of certain content and skills; authorizing a district school board or developmental research school participating in the Mastery-Based Education Pilot Program to use an alternative interpretation of letter grades for certain students, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mastery-based Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-08SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/04/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-14SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2019-03-14SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-12SenateCS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-01-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H401 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003436Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003437Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034996Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100723Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback