FL S0148 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Now in Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Commerce And Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing certain food service establishments to sell or deliver certain alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption under certain circumstances; providing requirements for such establishments to sell alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption; requiring that such alcoholic beverages be transported in a specified manner; specifying that certain alcoholic beverages sold by such establishments are not open containers for the purposes of the prohibition on possessing open containers of alcoholic beverages in vehicles, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beverage Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2021-02-18SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-02-16SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 02/16/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2020-12-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S134 (Similar To) 2020-12-09 - Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
H329 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Now in Commerce Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3161936Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56120Amended CodeSee Bill Text
561575Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback