FL S0134 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing certain food service establishments to sell or deliver alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption if specified requirements are met; revising provisions that authorize a restaurant to allow patrons to remove partially consumed bottles of wine from a restaurant for off-premises consumption; revising requirements for the sale of alcoholic beverages by certain vendors, etc.
Title
Beverage Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2020-12-04 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S142 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 46 (Ch. 2021-166), CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30)
S148 (Similar To) 2021-05-14 - Chapter No. 2021-30
H329 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30)
S148 (Similar To) 2021-05-14 - Chapter No. 2021-30
H329 (Similar To) 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 1936 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
564 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
564 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
565 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/134 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/134/BillText/Filed/HTML |