FL S0142 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-09 - Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
Pending: Senate Regulated Industries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing provisions relating to limitations on the size of individual wine containers and the size of individual cider containers; revising provisions that authorize a restaurant to allow patrons to remove partially consumed bottles of wine from the restaurant for off-premises consumption; revising the requirements for the sale of branded products by a licensed distillery or craft distillery to consumers; revising requirements relating to the shipping of distilled spirits to consumers by a craft distillery, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Beverage Law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-09SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2020-12-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S134 (Similar To) 2020-12-09 - Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
S46 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Now in Rules
H329 (Similar To) 2021-02-18 - Now in Commerce Committee
H737 (Similar To) 2021-02-26 - Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
H6073 (Similar To) 2021-02-22 - Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
561221Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56405Amended CodeSee Bill Text
564055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56409Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56503Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback