FL S0046 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-18 - Now in Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing craft distilleries to be licensed as specified vendors under certain circumstances; requiring certain alcoholic beverages to be obtained through a licensed distributor; prohibiting a distillery from operating as a craft distillery until certain requirements are met; authorizing persons to have common ownership in craft distilleries under certain circumstances; requiring a minimum percentage of a craft distillery's total finished branded products to be distilled in this state and contain one or more Florida agricultural products after a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Craft Distilleries

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18SenateNow in Rules
2021-02-16SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-02-15SenateCS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2021-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/15/21, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2021-01-28SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2021-01-27SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-01-26SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-01-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/26/21, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-12-21SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2020-12-18SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S142 (Similar To) 2020-12-09 - Referred to Regulated Industries; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
H737 (Same As) 2021-02-26 - Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
56502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56517Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback