FL H0329 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes food service establishments to sell or deliver alcoholic beverages for off-premises consumption if requirements are met; revises provisions that authorize restaurant to allow patrons to remove partially consumed bottles of wine from restaurant for off-premises consumption; revises requirements for sale of alcoholic beverages by certain vendors.
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Licenses
Sponsors
House Commerce Committee | Rep. Josie Tomkow [R] | Rep. Alex Andrade [R] | Rep. Kristen Arrington [D] |
Rep. Daisy Morales [D] | Rep. Angela Nixon [D] | Rep. Allison Tant [D] | Rep. Susan Valdes [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - House Commerce Committee (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Regulatory Reform Subcommittee (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30) |
2021-04-13 | House | Substituted CS/SB 148 |
2021-04-08 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/13/2021) |
2021-03-31 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-31 | House | Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/31/2021) |
2021-03-22 | House | Added to Second Reading Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-22 | House | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) |
2021-03-19 | House | CS Filed |
2021-03-19 | House | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) |
2021-03-18 | House | Reported out of Commerce Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee |
2021-03-12 | House | Added to Commerce Committee agenda |
2021-03-02 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-02-18 | House | Now in Commerce Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-18 | House | Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda |
2021-02-03 | House | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Commerce Committee |
2021-02-03 | House | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S134 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30)
S142 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 46 (Ch. 2021-166), CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30)
S148 (Similar To) 2021-05-14 - Chapter No. 2021-30
S142 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Regulated Industries, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 46 (Ch. 2021-166), CS/SB 148 (Ch. 2021-30)
S148 (Similar To) 2021-05-14 - Chapter No. 2021-30
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
316 | 1936 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
561 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
564 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
564 | 09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
565 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |