FL S0138 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 937
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Florida Families First Act"; requiring the Department of Health to create public service announcements to educate the public on perinatal mental health care; revising components that are included in the postpartum evaluation and followup care required to be provided by birth centers to include a mental health screening and the provision of certain information on postpartum depression, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Perinatal Mental Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 937
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 937
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-03-01SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-27SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2018-02-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-29SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-01-24SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/16/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-08-28SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-08-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H937 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-98

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
383014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951053Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback