FL H0937 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-98
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires DOH to offer perinatal mental health care information through Family Health Line toll-free hotline accessible to general public; revises components included in postpartum evaluation & followup care provided by birth centers to include mental health screening & information on postpartum depression; provides appropriation.
Title
Perinatal Mental Health
Sponsors
House Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee | House Health Innovation Subcommittee | Rep. Jeanette Nunez [R] | Rep. Halsey Beshears [R] |
Rep. Nicholas Duran [D] | Rep. Katie Edwards [D] | Rep. Holly Raschein [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#699 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#699 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Chapter No. 2018-98 | |
2018-03-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-21 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2018-03-09 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 0 |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 138 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Received |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2018-03-01 | Senate | In Messages |
2018-03-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 750 |
2018-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2018-02-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-22 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-21 | House | Favorable by- Health and Human Services Committee; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health and Human Services Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2018-02-19 | House | Now in Health and Human Services Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-02-13 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-13 | House | CS/CS by Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-09 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee, 02/13/18, 9:30 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-26 | House | Now in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee |
2018-01-25 | House | CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee read 1st time |
2018-01-25 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-01-23 | House | CS by Health Innovation Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Health Innovation Subcommittee, 01/23/18, 1:30 pm, Mashburn Hall |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | House | Referred to Health Innovation Subcommittee; Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee; Health and Human Services Committee |
2017-12-07 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S138 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 937
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
383 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
383 | 318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 1053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |