IL SB3240 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Retitles the Act and adds provisions regarding the newly renamed Illinois Emergency Management Agency and Office of Homeland Security (IEMA-OHS). Adds responsibilities for IEMA-OHS with respect to nuclear and radiation safety. Provides for the appointment of a cabinet-level Homeland Security Advisor and a Deputy Homeland Security Advisor. Provides for the creation of an Illinois Homeland Security Advisory Council, and assigns the Council duties. Provides for the creation of the position of Statewide Interoperability Coordinator and assigns it duties. Adds and amends definitions.
Title
IEMA-OHS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 To Subcommittee on Procurement |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio |
2024-02-21 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Government Operations |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Porfirio |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3305 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3305 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3305 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3305 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |