MI HB5046 | 2023-2024 | 102nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 1 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Referred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
Pending: Senate Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Civil procedure: costs and fees; fees for transcripts; increase. Amends sec. 2543 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2543).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil procedure: costs and fees; fees for transcripts; increase. Amends sec. 2543 of 1961 PA 236 (MCL 600.2543).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-11-01 - House - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 434 (Y: 104 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - House - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-1 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-02SenateReferred To Committee On Civil Rights, Judiciary, And Public Safety
2023-11-01HouseTransmitted
2023-11-01HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 434 Yeas 104 Nays 6 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
2023-11-01HouseRead A Third Time
2023-10-31HousePlaced On Third Reading
2023-10-31HouseSubstitute (h-1) Adopted
2023-10-31HouseRead A Second Time
2023-10-17HouseReferred To Second Reading
2023-10-17HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute (h-1)
2023-09-27HouseBill Electronically Reproduced 09/26/2023
2023-09-26HouseReferred To Committee On Criminal Justice
2023-09-26HouseRead A First Time
2023-09-26HouseIntroduced By Representative Nate Shannon

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.mi.gov/Bills/Bill?ObjectName=2023-HB-5046
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billintroduced/House/htm/2023-HIB-5046.htm
Texthttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billengrossed/House/htm/2023-HEBH-5046.htm
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-5046-0N295.pdf
Amendmenthttps://legislature.mi.gov/mileg.aspx?page=CurrentVersionAmendment&cvFileName=2023-HCVBS-5046-0O338.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5046-736EFB8E.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5046-F9F35CAD.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5046-F884329A.pdf
Supplementhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/billanalysis/House/pdf/2023-HLA-5046-019BAD8A.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-10-17-085.htm
Roll Callhttps://legislature.mi.gov/documents/2023-2024/Journal/House/htm/2023-HJ-11-01-092.htm

Bill Comments

feedback