FL S0020 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Special Master on Claim Bills
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for the relief of Angela Sozzani; requiring that the Department of Children and Families request up to a certain amount in its legislative budget request for the 2021-2022 fiscal year to compensate Angela Sozzani for injuries and damages she sustained as a result of the negligence of individuals and entities licensed by the department, etc.
Title
Relief of Angela Sozzani by the Department of Children and Families
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Special Master on Claim Bills |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Referred to Special Master on Claim Bills; Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations; Rules |
2019-08-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6521 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/20 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/20/BillText/Filed/HTML |