FL S0004 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Chapter No. 2010-22, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Chapter No. 2010-22, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70)
Summary
Amends a provision relating to secondary school redesign, to delete obsolete provisions and to conform to changes made by the act. Revises requirements for middle grades promotion. Provides that successful completion of a high school level Algebra I, Geometry, or Biology I course is not contingent upon a student's performance on the end-of-course assessment. Revises requirements for high school graduation. Creates the Credit Acceleration Program, etc.
Title
Education Accountability [SPSC]
Sponsors
Rep. Thad Altman [R] | Sen. Carey Baker [R] | Sen. Nancy Detert [R] | Rep. Mike Fasano [R] |
Sen. Don Gaetz [R] | Sen. Joe Negron [R] | Sen. Durell Peaden [R] | Sen. Garrett Richter [R] |
Sen. Ronda Storms [R] | Sen. John Thrasher [R] | Sen. Stephen Wise [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Chapter No. 2010-22, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70) | |
2010-04-20 | Approved by Governor -SJ 00753 | |
2010-04-15 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -SJ 00618 | |
2010-04-09 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00576 | |
2010-04-08 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00635; CS passed; YEAS 106 NAYS 12 -HJ 00635 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted for CS/CS/HB 7053 -HJ 00615; Read 2nd time -HJ 00615; Amendment(s) failed -HJ 00615 | |
2010-04-05 | Received -HJ 00480; Referred to Calendar -HJ 00481 | |
2010-03-25 | In Messages | |
2010-03-24 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00329; Amendment(s) adopted (839348, 824818, 622996, 445874) -SJ 00330; CS passed as amended (839348, 824818, 622996, 445874); YEAS 36 NAYS 1 -SJ 00330 | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00314; Amendment(s) adopted (751614, 528770, 425306, 205274, 100062) -SJ 00314; Ordered engrossed -SJ 00318 | |
2010-03-22 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00270 | |
2010-03-18 | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-16 | CS/CS by- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means; YEAS 17 NAYS 7 -SJ 00270; CS read 1st time on 03/18/10 -SJ 00271 | |
2010-03-15 | Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00191; On Committee agenda-- Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means, 03/16/10, 4:00 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-11 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-03-10 | CS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 6 NAYS 2 -SJ 00190; CS read 1st time on 03/11/10 -SJ 00232 | |
2010-03-05 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/10/10, 1:00 pm, 301-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00013 | |
2010-03-01 | Filed; Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
H0061 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on PreK-12 Policy (EPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22)
H0473 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on PreK-12 Policy (EPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22)
H1173 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on PreK-12 Policy (EPC)
H7053 (Similar To) 2010-04-07 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 4; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70) -HJ 00615
S0120 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22)
S1154 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22)
S2262 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
H7037 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-70; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H0209 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on PreK-12 Policy (EPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22)
S0420 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22)
S1806 (Similar To) 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00855; Substituted HB 7037 -SJ 00855; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 00855
H0473 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on PreK-12 Policy (EPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22)
H1173 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on PreK-12 Policy (EPC)
H7053 (Similar To) 2010-04-07 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 4; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70) -HJ 00615
S0120 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22)
S1154 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22)
S2262 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
H7037 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-70; companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102)
H0209 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on PreK-12 Policy (EPC), companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22)
S0420 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22)
S1806 (Similar To) 2010-04-26 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00855; Substituted HB 7037 -SJ 00855; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70), CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), CS/CS/SB 1412 (Ch. 2010-102) -SJ 00855
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1003 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 428 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 429 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 4295 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1003 | 493 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1007 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 34 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 341 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1008 | 36 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/index.cfm?Mode=Bills&SubMenu=1&Tab=session&BI_Mode=ViewBillInfo&BillNum=0004&Chamber=Senate&Year=2010 |