FL H1173 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on PreK-12 Policy (EPC)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes formation of virtual charter school; revises provisions for funding Florida Virtual School; authorizes home education students to enroll in virtual instruction courses; exempts certain Florida-based nonpublic schools from requirements relating to attendance records & reports, school-entry health examinations, & student immunizations; revises provisions relating to school district virtual instruction programs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 Educational Instruction

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-30 Died in Committee on PreK-12 Policy (EPC)
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Education Policy Council -HJ 00105
2010-03-01 Referred to PreK-12 Policy (EPC); Full Appropriations Council on Education & Economic Development; Education Policy Council
2010-02-22 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0623 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages
H7053 (Similar To) 2010-04-07 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted CS/CS/SB 4; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 4 (Ch. 2010-22), HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70) -HJ 00615
S0534 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
S1124 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Education Pre-K - 12
S2262 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died on Calendar
S0004 (Similar To) 2010-04-21 - Chapter No. 2010-22, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7037 (Ch. 2010-70)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100237Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100241Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002452New CodeSee Bill Text
1003428Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100628Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100640Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101257Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback